OH HB342 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Effective 9/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4301.12, 4301.13, 4301.24, 4301.30, 4301.355, 4301.43, 4301.432, 4301.47, 4301.62, 4301.82, 4301.83, 4303.021, 4303.03, 4303.07, 4303.10, 4303.181, 4303.182, 4303.204, 4303.33, 4303.333, and 5709.55 and to enact section 4303.031 of the Revised Code to create the Ohio Farm Winery Permit and to authorize the Division of Liquor Control to issue a D-5l liquor permit to a premises that is located in a municipal corporation that is wholly within the geographic boundaries of a township, provided that a specified population density applies to the municipal corporation and township.
Title
Creates the Ohio Farm Winery Permit
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Effective 9/28/16 | |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-25 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-27 | House | Passed |
2015-12-09 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-10-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2015-09-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 01 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 432 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 82 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
43 | 03 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 03 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 333 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 09 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |