OH HB341 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-29)
Status: Passed on December 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-16 - Effective 12/16/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 121.22, 2925.01, 2925.61, 4723.50, 4723.52, 4729.01, 4729.29, 4729.44, 4729.45, 4729.51, 4729.514, 4729.541, 4729.553, 4729.80, 4730.56, and 4731.83; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4723.486 (4723.488), 4723.488 (4723.484), and 4730.431 (4730.434); and to enact new section 4723.486 and sections 4723.485, 4729.515, 4730.435, and 4730.436 of the Revised Code regarding the administration of addiction treatment drugs, federal agency access to the Ohio Automated Rx Reporting System, the Board of Pharmacy's exemption from open meetings requirements, the occasional sale of certain drugs at wholesale, and naloxone access and education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards administering addiction treatment drugs

Sponsors

Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-16 Effective 12/16/20
2020-09-01HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-08-31HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-06-24SenatePassed - Amended
2020-06-09SenateReported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-05-06SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced
2020-02-12HousePassed
2020-02-11HouseInformally passed
2020-02-10HouseInformally passed
2020-02-06HouseInformally passed
2020-01-15HouseReported - Substitute: Health
2019-10-02HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-09-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12122Amended CodeCitation Text
292501Amended CodeCitation Text
292561Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4723Amended CodeCitation Text
4723486Amended CodeCitation Text
4723488Amended CodeCitation Text
472350Amended CodeCitation Text
472352Amended CodeCitation Text
4729Amended CodeCitation Text
472901Amended CodeCitation Text
472929Amended CodeCitation Text
472944Amended CodeCitation Text
472945Amended CodeCitation Text
472951Amended CodeCitation Text
4729514Amended CodeCitation Text
4729541Amended CodeCitation Text
4729553Amended CodeCitation Text
472980Amended CodeCitation Text
4730Amended CodeCitation Text
4730431Amended CodeCitation Text
473056Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473183Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback