OH HB339 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Enrolled on September 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 167.03, 1317.04, 1317.05, 1751.32, 1751.74, 1751.84, 1753.31, 3901.045, 3901.45, 3901.811, 3901.87, 3902.08, 3903.01, 3903.52, 3903.56, 3903.71, 3903.724, 3903.728, 3903.7211, 3903.74, 3904.01, 3904.16, 3905.051, 3905.14, 3905.84, 3905.85, 3905.87, 3907.15, 3909.04, 3911.24, 3913.11, 3913.40, 3915.05, 3915.053, 3915.073, 3915.13, 3916.171, 3919.14, 3922.11, 3922.14, 3923.021, 3923.04, 3923.53, 3925.09, 3927.08, 3929.04, 3930.10, 3931.03, 3931.99, 3941.46, 3951.04, 3951.06, 3951.10, 3953.14, 3956.01, 3959.01, 3960.07, 3964.19, 3999.16, 4505.11, and 4509.70 and to enact section 1.301 of the Revised Code to enact the "Insurance Code Correction Act" to make technical, corrective, and other changes to the laws governing insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Insurance Code Correction Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-09-22HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-09-02SenatePassed
2020-09-02SenateReported - Amended: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-07-21SenateRecommitted: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-06-09SenateReported - Substitute: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-05-13SenateRefer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-05-11SenateIntroduced
2020-05-06HousePassed
2019-12-11HouseReported - Substitute: Insurance
2019-09-24HouseRefer to Committee: Insurance
2019-09-17HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
167Amended CodeCitation Text
16703Amended CodeCitation Text
131704Amended CodeCitation Text
131705Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1751Amended CodeCitation Text
175132Amended CodeCitation Text
175174Amended CodeCitation Text
175184Amended CodeCitation Text
1753Amended CodeCitation Text
175331Amended CodeCitation Text
39Amended CodeCitation Text
3901Amended CodeCitation Text
3901045Amended CodeCitation Text
390145Amended CodeCitation Text
3901811Amended CodeCitation Text
390187Amended CodeCitation Text
3902Amended CodeCitation Text
390208Amended CodeCitation Text
3903Amended CodeCitation Text
390301Amended CodeCitation Text
390352Amended CodeCitation Text
390356Amended CodeCitation Text
390371Amended CodeCitation Text
39037211Amended CodeCitation Text
3903724Amended CodeCitation Text
3903728Amended CodeCitation Text
390374Amended CodeCitation Text
3904Amended CodeCitation Text
390401Amended CodeCitation Text
390416Amended CodeCitation Text
3905Amended CodeCitation Text
3905051Amended CodeCitation Text
390514Amended CodeCitation Text
390584Amended CodeCitation Text
390585Amended CodeCitation Text
390587Amended CodeCitation Text
390715Amended CodeCitation Text
3909Amended CodeCitation Text
390904Amended CodeCitation Text
3911Amended CodeCitation Text
391124Amended CodeCitation Text
3913Amended CodeCitation Text
391311Amended CodeCitation Text
391340Amended CodeCitation Text
3915Amended CodeCitation Text
391505Amended CodeCitation Text
3915053Amended CodeCitation Text
3915073Amended CodeCitation Text
391513Amended CodeCitation Text
3916Amended CodeCitation Text
3916171Amended CodeCitation Text
3919Amended CodeCitation Text
391914Amended CodeCitation Text
3922Amended CodeCitation Text
392211Amended CodeCitation Text
392214Amended CodeCitation Text
3923Amended CodeCitation Text
3923021Amended CodeCitation Text
392304Amended CodeCitation Text
392353Amended CodeCitation Text
3925Amended CodeCitation Text
392509Amended CodeCitation Text
3927Amended CodeCitation Text
392708Amended CodeCitation Text
3929Amended CodeCitation Text
392904Amended CodeCitation Text
3930Amended CodeCitation Text
393010Amended CodeCitation Text
3931Amended CodeCitation Text
393103Amended CodeCitation Text
393199Amended CodeCitation Text
3941Amended CodeCitation Text
394146Amended CodeCitation Text
3951Amended CodeCitation Text
395104Amended CodeCitation Text
395106Amended CodeCitation Text
395110Amended CodeCitation Text
3953Amended CodeCitation Text
395314Amended CodeCitation Text
3956Amended CodeCitation Text
395601Amended CodeCitation Text
3959Amended CodeCitation Text
395901Amended CodeCitation Text
3960Amended CodeCitation Text
396007Amended CodeCitation Text
3964Amended CodeCitation Text
396419Amended CodeCitation Text
3999Amended CodeCitation Text
399916Amended CodeCitation Text
450511Amended CodeCitation Text
450970Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HB-339
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/RCS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/RRS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/bills/hb339/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HB-339

Bill Comments

feedback