OH HB338 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-11)
Status: Enrolled on December 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3327.10 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing medical examinations for school bus drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards school bus driver medical examinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-05SenatePassed
2018-12-05SenateReported - Amended: Rules and Reference
2018-11-14SenateRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2018-05-16SenateReported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform
2018-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-12-18SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13HousePassed
2017-12-07HouseReported: Education and Career Readiness
2017-09-19HouseRefer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness
2017-09-11HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3327Amended CodeCitation Text
332710Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3713Amended CodeCitation Text
3713022Amended CodeCitation Text
371399Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-HB-338
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/RCS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/RRS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb338/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-HB-338

Bill Comments

feedback