OH HB336 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Effective 11/2/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Effective 11/2/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To require the registrar of motor vehicles to establish a six month driver's license reinstatement fee debt reduction and amnesty program and to name this act the Reinstatement Fee Amnesty Initiative.
Title
Create driver's license reinstatement fee amnesty initiative
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | Effective 11/2/18 | |
2018-06-27 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2017-09-05 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Transportation : Drivers' Licenses
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 51 | 354 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 52 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 52 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 07 | 1614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 09 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 10 | 037 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 10 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |