OH HB336 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2014 - 50% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 5735.01, 5735.012, 5739.025, 5747.98, and 5751.98 and to enact sections 122.079, 5735.015, 5735.016, 5747.78, and 5751.55 of the Revised Code to create the Gaseous Fuel Vehicle Conversion Program, to allow a credit against the income or commercial activity tax for the purchase or conversion of an alternative fuel vehicle, to reduce the amount of sales tax due on the purchase or lease of a qualifying electric vehicle by up to $500, to apply the motor fuel tax to the distribution or sale of compressed natural gas, to authorize a temporary, partial motor fuel tax exemption for sales of compressed natural gas used as motor fuel, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To create the Gaseous Fuel Vehicle Conversion Program, to allow a credit against the income or commercial activity tax for the purchase or conversion of an alternative fuel vehicle, to reduce the amount of sales tax due on the purchase or lease of a qualifying electric vehicle by up to $500, to apply the motor fuel tax to the distribution or sale of compressed natural gas, to authorize a temporary, partial motor fuel tax exemption for sales of compressed natural gas used as motor fuel, and to make an appropriation.

Sponsors

Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Rep. Nick Barborak [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Heather Bishoff [D]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Tony Burkley [R]
Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]
Rep. Michael Curtin [D]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]
Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]
Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Chris Redfern [D]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]
Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]
Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Mike Foley [D]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. William Batchelder [R]

Roll Calls

2014-03-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-27 To Finance
2014-03-27 Introduced to Senate
2014-03-26 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-03-12 Committee Report - A
2013-11-06 To Finance and Appropriations
2013-11-06 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
122New CodeSee Bill Text
122079New CodeSee Bill Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5735Amended CodeCitation Text
573501Amended CodeCitation Text
5735012Amended CodeCitation Text
5735015New CodeSee Bill Text
5735016New CodeSee Bill Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
5739025Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574778New CodeSee Bill Text
574798Amended CodeCitation Text
5751Amended CodeCitation Text
575155New CodeSee Bill Text
575198Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback