OH HB335 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-20 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.20 and 1907.02 and to enact section 4511.072 of the Revised Code to specify the jurisdiction of municipal and county courts over municipal traffic ordinances and to establish requirements governing fines, fees, or other charges for traffic violations and infractions imposed by a municipal corporation that does not have the authority to establish a mayor's court.
Title
Specifies requirements for municipal traffic ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-04-12 | House | Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported: Local Government |
2015-10-01 | House | Refer to Committee: Local Government |
2015-09-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
State and Local Government : Local Government
Transportation
Transportation : Traffic Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 11 | 072 | New Code | See Bill Text |