OH HB334 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 74-26)
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2925.01, 2925.03, 2925.11, 2925.55, 2925.56, 2925.57, 2929.01, 3715.05, 3719.013, and 3719.41 and to enact sections 109.89, 3715.051, 3715.052, 3715.053, and 3715.054 of the Revised Code to establish procedures regarding the participation of pharmacies, retailers, and the Attorney General in electronically tracking pseudoephedrine and ephedrine product sales through a national exchange; to specify that certain classes of compounds and individual compounds are schedule I controlled substances; to create the offenses of trafficking in and possession of controlled substance analogs; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish procedures regarding the participation of pharmacies, retailers, and the Attorney General in electronically tracking pseudoephedrine and ephedrine product sales through a national exchange; to specify that certain classes of compounds and individual compounds are schedule I controlled substances; to create the offenses of trafficking in and possession of controlled substance analogs; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]
Sen. Dave Burke [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]
Rep. Mike Foley [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]
Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]
Rep. Ron Maag [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]
Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]
Sen. Christopher Widener [R]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-05 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-20 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-27 End of 10-day period
2012-12-14 Sent to Governor
2012-12-05 Concurrence
2012-12-04 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-04 Committee Report - S
2012-05-10 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2012-05-10 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-09 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-03-28 Committee Report - S
2011-09-27 To Health & Aging
2011-09-27 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
109New CodeSee Bill Text
10988New CodeSee Bill Text
10989New CodeSee Bill Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2925Amended CodeCitation Text
292501Amended CodeCitation Text
292503Amended CodeCitation Text
292511Amended CodeCitation Text
292555Amended CodeCitation Text
292556Amended CodeCitation Text
292557Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292901Amended CodeCitation Text
37Amended CodeCitation Text
3715Amended CodeCitation Text
371505Amended CodeCitation Text
3715051New CodeSee Bill Text
3715052New CodeSee Bill Text
3715053New CodeSee Bill Text
3715054New CodeSee Bill Text
3719Amended CodeCitation Text
3719013Amended CodeCitation Text
371941Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback