OH HB329 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1333.91, 1333.92, 1333.93, and 1333.94 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing pyramid promotional schemes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify law governing pyramid promotional schemes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-13SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2017-12-11SenateIntroduced
2017-12-05HousePassed
2017-11-28HouseReported - Substitute: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-09-12HouseRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-08-30HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1333Amended CodeCitation Text
133391Amended CodeCitation Text
133392Amended CodeCitation Text
133393Amended CodeCitation Text
133394Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback