OH HB311 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-13)
Status: Passed on December 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-13)
Status: Passed on December 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-19 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 323.152 and 4503.065 of the Revised Code and Section 803.80 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly to clarify the effective date of an income tax deduction, to extend the availability of a corporation franchise tax credit, to clarify that a person eligible for the homestead exemption without income limits continues to receive that exemption if the person's homestead changes, and to declare an emergency.
Title
And Section 803.80 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly to clarify the effective date of an income tax deduction, to extend the availability of a corporation franchise tax credit, to clarify that a person eligible for the homestead exemption without income limits continues to receive that exemption if the person's homestead changes, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Passed as emergency measure (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Passed as emergency measure (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Effective Date | |
2013-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2013-12-24 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-12-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-12-04 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-21 | To Finance | |
2013-11-21 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-11-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-24 | To Ways and Means | |
2013-10-24 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
3 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 19 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
3 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
3 | 23 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 03 | 065 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 05 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 33 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 41 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |