OH HB303 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 109.57, 1337.11, 2133.01, 2305.113, 2305.234, 2317.54, 2711.22, 3701.881, 3701.92, 3701.923, 3701.924, 3701.925, 3701.926, 3701.927, 3701.928, 3701.929, 3712.01, 3712.03, 3712.09, 3712.99, 3721.01, 3793.11, 3795.01, 3963.01, 4503.44, 4719.01, 4723.01, 4723.03, 4723.06, 4723.063, 4723.07, 4723.08, 4723.09, 4723.17, 4723.171, 4723.24, 4723.271, 4723.28, 4723.32, 4723.34, 4723.35, 4723.41, 4723.42, 4723.43, 4723.431, 4723.44, 4723.48, 4723.482, 4723.485, 4723.487, 4723.50, 4723.61, 4723.64, 4723.65, 4723.651, 4723.652, 4723.66, 4723.67, 4723.68, 4723.69, 4723.71, 4723.72, 4723.73, 4723.74, 4723.75, 4723.751, 4723.76, 4723.77, 4723.79, 4723.83, 4723.84, 4723.87, 4723.88, 4723.99, 4752.02, 4759.01, 4759.03, 4759.05, 4759.06, 4759.10, 5111.222, 5111.231, 5111.24, 5111.242, 5111.246, 5111.25, 5111.88, 5111.981, 5119.22, and 5120.55; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 4723.17 (4723.18) and 4723.171 (4723.181); to enact new section 4723.17 and sections 3712.031, 3712.041, 3712.051, 3712.061, 4723.091, 4723.092, 4723.19, 4723.653, and 5111.982; to repeal sections 4723.483, 4723.62, 4723.621, 4723.63, and 4723.78 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 3.19 of Am. Sub. H.B. 95 of the 125th General Assembly to revise the laws administered by the Board of Nursing and the professionals regulated by the Board; to update statutory references to professional organizations of dietitians; to extend qualified immunity from civil liability for volunteer services provided by certain behavioral health professionals; to modify the requirements for licensure of methadone treatment programs; to make changes in the laws governing certain Medicaid payments for nursing facility services; to authorize certain assessments of persons with intellectual disabilities residing in intermediate care facilities; to enact "Sarah's Law" regarding the licensure of pediatric respite care programs, to amend the version of section 109.57 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on January 1, 2014, to continue amendments made by this act to that section; and to declare an emergency.
Title
That is scheduled to take effect on January 1, 2014, to continue amendments made by this act to that section; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House - Senate Amendments - Emergency Clause (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-20 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-12 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-11 | Committee Report* S | |
2012-05-16 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2012-05-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-04-18 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-07-26 | To Health & Aging | |
2011-07-26 | Introduced to House |