OH HB3 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.744, 109.803, 2903.01, 2919.25, 2919.27, 2929.12, 2929.13, 2929.14, 2929.22, 2935.03, 2935.032, 2937.23, and 3113.31; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 2935.033 (2935.034); and to enact new section 2935.033 and section 2919.261 of the Revised Code to make changes to civil and criminal law regarding domestic violence, to address State Highway Patrol arrest authority, to name the act Aisha's Law, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Aisha's Law regarding domestic violence / arrest authority

Sponsors

Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Latyna Humphrey [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Kevin Miller [R]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]
Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]

Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-11-02SenateIntroduced
2021-10-27HousePassed
2021-10-26HouseReported: Rules and Reference
2021-10-25HouseReported - Substitute - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Criminal Justice
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
109744Amended CodeCitation Text
109803Amended CodeCitation Text
290301Amended CodeCitation Text
291925Amended CodeCitation Text
291927Amended CodeCitation Text
292912Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
292914Amended CodeCitation Text
292922Amended CodeCitation Text
293503Amended CodeCitation Text
2935032Amended CodeCitation Text
2935033Amended CodeCitation Text
293723Amended CodeCitation Text
311331Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-3
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb3/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb3/RH/01/hb3_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb3/RH/02/hb3_02_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb3/PH/03/hb3_03_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15761&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16779&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17630&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17668&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17741&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17968&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-3

Bill Comments

feedback