OH HB3 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.744, 109.803, 2903.01, 2919.25, 2919.27, 2929.12, 2929.13, 2929.14, 2929.22, 2935.032, 2937.23, and 3113.31; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 2935.033 (2935.034); and to enact new section 2935.033 and section 2919.261 of the Revised Code; and to amend Section 221.10 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to add domestic violence circumstances to the offense of aggravated murder, to expand the offense of domestic violence to also prohibit strangulation of a family or household member, to require law enforcement officers to utilize a qualified lethality assessment screening tool to refer high risk victims to domestic violence resources, to create the Domestic Violence Prosecution Study Committee, to name this act Aisha's Law, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Address high-risk domestic violence and victimization

Sponsors

Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Phil Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]

Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateIntroduced
2020-05-20HousePassed
2020-05-20HouseReported: Finance
2020-05-19HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2020-05-19HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-05-21HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-05-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109744Amended CodeCitation Text
109803Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
290301Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
291925Amended CodeCitation Text
291927Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292912Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
292914Amended CodeCitation Text
292922Amended CodeCitation Text
2935Amended CodeCitation Text
2935032Amended CodeCitation Text
2935033Amended CodeCitation Text
293723Amended CodeCitation Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3113Amended CodeCitation Text
311331Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback