OH HB3 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Effective 9/24/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-24 - Effective 9/24/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 111.16, 1329.01, and 1703.04 and to enact sections 6301.16 and 6301.17 of the Revised Code to reduce certain business filing fees charged and collected by the Secretary of State, to modify the required contents of foreign corporation filings, to specify that all Ohio-based companies are to have the same access to employer application services available through the OhioMeansJobs web site, and to require the Governor's Executive Workforce Board to prepare an annual report on the performance of the web site.
Title
Addresses filing fees and website access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-24 | Effective 9/24/15 | |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported: State and Local Government |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported - Substitute: Economic and Workforce Development |
2015-02-10 | House | To committee: Economic and Workforce Development |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce
Economic Development
Employment : Workforce Development
State and Local Government : State Government
Economic Development
Employment : Workforce Development
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 11 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
13 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
13 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 03 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
63 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
63 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 01 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 01 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |