OH HB294 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Effective 5/23/16 - Effective: May 23, 2016; Sections 3 and 4 effective February 21, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Effective 5/23/16 - Effective: May 23, 2016; Sections 3 and 4 effective February 21, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 3701.034 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 289.20 of Am. Sub. H.B. 64 of the 131st General Assembly to require the Department of Health to ensure that state funds and certain federal funds are not used either to perform or promote nontherapeutic abortions, or to contract or affiliate with any entity that performs or promotes nontherapeutic abortions; to provide for health departments and WIC clinics to determine presumptive eligibility for pregnant women and children; and to allocate existing funding within the Ohio Department of Health's budget to the Ohio Association of Community Health Centers for safe sleep, birth spacing, and smoking cessation initiatives.
Title
Prevents the use of public funds for elective abortions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Effective 5/23/16 - Effective: May 23, 2016; Sections 3 and 4 effective February 21, 2016 | |
2016-02-10 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Passed |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-17 | House | Passed |
2015-11-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Community and Family Advancement |
2015-09-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement |
2015-07-30 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Finance and Appropriations
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Medicaid
Health and Human Services : Public Assistance
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Medicaid
Health and Human Services : Public Assistance
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 01 | 034 | New Code | See Bill Text |