OH HB292 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-29)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-29)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 122.98 of the Revised Code to create the Ohio Aerospace and Aviation Technology Committee.
Title
To create the Ohio Aerospace and Aviation Technology Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-17 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-27 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-04 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-22 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-12-12 | To State Government Oversight & Reform | |
2013-12-12 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-19 | Committee Report | |
2013-10-10 | To Economic Development and Regulatory Reform | |
2013-10-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
1 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 22 | 98 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 93 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 93 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |