OH HB291 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 65-37)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Effective 7/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4501.21, 5533.04, and 5533.626 and to enact sections 4503.507, 4503.516, 4503.517, 4503.518, 4503.578, 4503.597, 4503.703, 4503.755, 5534.409, 5534.414, 5534.415, 5534.416, 5534.418, 5534.419, 5534.431, 5534.432, 5534.433, 5534.603, 5534.604, 5534.605, 5534.606, 5534.816, 5534.819, 5534.828, 5534.837, 5534.838, 5534.841, 5534.872, 5534.897, 5534.899, 5534.912, and 5534.923 of the Revised Code to amend and designate multiple memorial highways and memorial bridges and to create multiple new specialty license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Staff Sgt. Kyle R. McKee Memorial Highway

Sponsors

Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]
Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]
Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]
Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]
Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06 Effective 7/21/22
2022-04-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-10-06SenatePassed
2021-10-06SenateReported - Substitute: Transportation
2021-09-08SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation
2021-06-24HousePassed
2021-06-23HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-05-11HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-05-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
450121Amended CodeCitation Text
4503507New CodeSee Bill Text
4503516New CodeSee Bill Text
4503517New CodeSee Bill Text
4503518New CodeSee Bill Text
4503578New CodeSee Bill Text
4503597New CodeSee Bill Text
4503703New CodeSee Bill Text
4503755New CodeSee Bill Text
553304Amended CodeCitation Text
5533626Amended CodeCitation Text
5534409New CodeSee Bill Text
5534414New CodeSee Bill Text
5534415New CodeSee Bill Text
5534416New CodeSee Bill Text
5534418New CodeSee Bill Text
5534419New CodeSee Bill Text
5534431New CodeSee Bill Text
5534432New CodeSee Bill Text
5534433New CodeSee Bill Text
5534603New CodeSee Bill Text
5534604New CodeSee Bill Text
5534605New CodeSee Bill Text
5534606New CodeSee Bill Text
5534816New CodeSee Bill Text
5534819New CodeSee Bill Text
5534828New CodeSee Bill Text
5534837New CodeSee Bill Text
5534838New CodeSee Bill Text
5534841New CodeSee Bill Text
5534872New CodeSee Bill Text
5534897New CodeSee Bill Text
5534899New CodeSee Bill Text
5534912New CodeSee Bill Text
5534923New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-291
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb291/IN/00/hb291_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb291/RH/01/hb291_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb291/PH/02/hb291_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb291/RS/03/hb291_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb291/PS/04/hb291_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb291/EN/05/hb291_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16649&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16683&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17131&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17119&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17121&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17141&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17229&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17271&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17522&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17523&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17526&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17531&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18912&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18959&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-291

Bill Comments

feedback