OH HB291 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-9)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3.30, 153.24, 305.04, 309.03, 311.02, 313.03, 315.03, 317.02, 319.02, 321.02, 325.071, 325.12, 329.01, 505.02, 505.03, 507.02, 507.021, 507.03, 509.02, 519.161, 705.27, 705.60, 733.65, 733.69, 735.03, 739.02, 747.01, 749.22, 755.23, 955.12, 1901.32, 1907.20, 2101.03, 2151.12, 2153.10, 2301.12, 2303.02, 3313.23, 3313.25, 3314.011, 3319.05, 3375.32, 5155.04, 5571.04, 5593.05 and to enact section 3.061 of the Revised Code to allow certain political subdivisions to adopt a policy authorizing the use of an "employee dishonesty and faithful performance of duty policy" instead of individual surety bonds for officers, employees, and appointees who are otherwise required by law to give bond before entering upon the discharge of duties.
Title
Authorize insurance in lieu of bonds for local officers/employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-11-30 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-06-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Commerce : Insurance
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : Public Officials and Employees