OH HB290 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on December 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-12-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0714, 3306.51, 3306.53, 3306.54, 3306.55, 3306.58, 3313.603, 3314.028, and 3314.35 and to enact sections 3301.94, 3306.59, and 3333.0410 of the Revised Code to include Junior ROTC as a permitted elective within the Ohio Core curriculum, to permit schools to excuse Junior ROTC students from high school physical education, to clarify the conditions under which a community school must close for poor academic performance, to specify conditions under which certain community schools may obtain new sponsors, to permit the Department of Education and the Chancellor of the Board of Regents to establish a longitudinal student data system, to extend the deadline for certain school districts to secure voter approval of bonds and tax levies for the districts' shares of state-assisted classroom facilities projects, to make performance of the Harmon Commission's duties contingent on the availability of funding, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To include Junior ROTC as a permitted elective within the Ohio Core curriculum, to permit schools to excuse Junior ROTC students from high school physical education, to clarify the conditions under which a community school must close for poor academic performance, to specify conditions under which certain community schools may obtain new sponsors, to permit the Department of Education and the Chancellor of the Board of Regents to establish a longitudinal student data system, to extend the deadline for certain school districts to secure voter approval of bonds and tax levies for the districts' shares of state-assisted classroom facilities projects, to make performance of the Harmon Commission's duties contingent on the availability of funding, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2009-12-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-12-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-11-18 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-28 | Effective Date | |
2009-12-28 | Governor' Action | |
2010-01-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2009-12-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-12-17 | Concurrence | |
2009-12-16 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2009-12-16 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-11-19 | To Education | |
2009-11-19 | Introduced to Senate | |
2009-11-18 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-11-05 | Committee Report | |
2009-09-29 | To Education | |
2009-09-29 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 01 | 0714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 94 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 06 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 06 | 53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 06 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 06 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 06 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 06 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 028 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 33 | 0410 | New Code | See Bill Text |