OH HB29 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 2925.62 of the Revised Code to prohibit sales of dextromethorphan without a prescription to persons under age 18.
Title
Prohibit selling dextromethorphan to person under 18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | Senate | Reported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-13 | House | Passed |
2019-11-13 | House | Reported: Health |
2019-02-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
29 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
29 | 25 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |