OH HB289 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-07-18 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-07-18 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 931.02, 931.03, 931.04, 931.99, 5709.28, and 5713.08 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law governing agricultural security areas.
Title
Agricultural security areas-revise law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-18 | Effective Date | |
2008-04-18 | Governor Action | |
2008-04-22 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-04-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-04-08 | Concurrence | |
2008-04-01 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-03-13 | Committee Report | |
2007-12-13 | To Agriculture | |
2007-12-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2007-12-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-11-01 | Committee Report | |
2007-07-24 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2007-07-24 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_289 |