OH HB287 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Effective 9/15/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5166.09 of the Revised Code regarding Medicaid home and community-based waiver services for relatives of active duty military.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards Medicaid waivers for relatives of active duty military

Sponsors

Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joe Miller [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phil Robinson [D]
Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]
Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]
Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]

Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15 Effective 9/15/20
2020-05-20SenatePassed
2020-05-20SenateReported: Finance Subcommittee on Health and Medicaid
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Finance Subcommittee on Health and Medicaid
2019-11-07SenateIntroduced
2019-11-06HousePassed
2019-10-30HouseReported: Health
2019-06-25HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-06-18HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51New CodeSee Bill Text
5166New CodeSee Bill Text
516609New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback