OH HB286 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-29)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3702.51, 3702.594, 3712.01, and 4731.054 and to enact sections 3701.36, 3701.361, 3701.362, 3712.10, and 3712.11 of the Revised Code to create the Palliative Care and Quality of Life Interdisciplinary Council and a related education program, to require identification of patients and residents who could benefit from palliative care, to authorize hospice care programs to provide palliative care in their inpatient facilities or units to non-hospice patients, to specify that Medicaid coverage for palliative care is not being expanded, to modify the pain management clinic licensing law relative to certain palliative care patients, and to authorize the Director of Health to approve the transfer of certain nursing home beds to a facility in a contiguous county.
Title
Identify need and provide support for palliative care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-12 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-29 | House | Passed |
2017-10-26 | House | Reported - Substitute: Aging and Long Term Care |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Aging and Long Term Care |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 01 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 01 | 361 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 01 | 362 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 02 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 02 | 594 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 12 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 12 | 063 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 12 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 12 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |