OH HB283 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3107.05 and to enact sections 3107.041, 3107.042, 3107.043, 3107.044, 3107.045, 3107.046, 3107.047, 3107.048, 3107.049, and 3107.131 of the Revised Code regarding certain adoptions involving abused, neglected, or dependent children and to allow posthumous final decrees of adoption.
Title
Require juvenile judge to consent to adoption of abused children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Juvenile and Family Law : Adoption
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Juvenile and Family Law : Foster Care
Juvenile and Family Law : Child Welfare
Juvenile and Family Law : Foster Care
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
31 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 07 | 041 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 042 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 043 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 044 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 046 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 047 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 048 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 049 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 07 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 07 | 131 | New Code | See Bill Text |