OH HB28 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Effective 6/28/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Effective 6/28/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To make appropriations for the Industrial Commission for the biennium beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2019, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of Commission
Title
Creates FY 2018-2019 Industrial Commission budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Effective 6/28/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported: Finance |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-referred: Finance |
2017-03-15 | House | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2017-02-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced |