OH HB28 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-15 - Effective 10/15/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-15 - Effective 10/15/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 3345.37 of the Revised Code with regard to suicide prevention programs at state institutions of higher education.
Title
Requires suicide prevention programs at state colleges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-15 | Effective 10/15/15 | |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reported: Education |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported - Amended: Community and Family Advancement |
2015-02-10 | House | To committee: Community and Family Advancement |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 45 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |