OH HB279 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Ohio History Connection to designate John Glenn's childhood home as a state historic site.
Title
Designate John Glenn's childhood home as historical site
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2017-10-26 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2017-06-20 | House | Introduced |