OH HB278 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3901.21, 3937.18, 3937.30, 3937.31, 3937.32, 3937.33, 3937.34, 3937.35, 4505.11, 4509.01, 4509.20, 4509.41, and 4509.51 and to enact section 3937.46 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law governing automobile insurance policies, to increase the minimum amounts required for valid proof of financial responsibility, to make it an unfair and deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance to charge excessive, inadequate, or unfairly discriminatory premium rates in private passenger automobile insurance based solely on the insured's residence location, to reduce from two years to one year the minimum policy period for automobile insurance policies, to prohibit an automobile insurer from enforcing certain intrafamily exclusions, and to permit insurance companies to obtain a salvage certificate of title for a motor vehicle in certain circumstances when the insurance company does not have possession of the certificate of title.
Title
To make changes to the law governing automobile insurance policies, to increase the minimum amounts required for valid proof of financial responsibility, to make it an unfair and deceptive act or practice in the business of insurance to charge excessive, inadequate, or unfairly discriminatory premium rates in private passenger automobile insurance based solely on the insured's residence location, to reduce from two years to one year the minimum policy period for automobile insurance policies, to prohibit an automobile insurer from enforcing certain intrafamily exclusions, and to permit insurance companies to obtain a salvage certificate of title for a motor vehicle in certain circumstances when the insurance company does not have possession of the certificate of title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Effective Date | |
2012-12-20 | Governor' Action | |
2012-12-31 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-12-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-12-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-12-13 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-12-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-12-05 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2012-12-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-11-28 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-22 | To Insurance | |
2011-06-22 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 37 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 37 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 05 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 09 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 09 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |