OH HB276 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 32-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2907.01 and 2923.31 and to enact section 2907.251 of the Revised Code to prohibit a person from receiving proceeds of prostitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit receiving proceeds of prostitution

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2022-04-05SenateIntroduced
2022-03-30HousePassed
2022-03-28HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2021-05-04HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-04-27HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290701Amended CodeCitation Text
2907251New CodeSee Bill Text
292331Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-276
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb276/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb276/RH/01/hb276_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb276/PH/02/hb276_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17165&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17645&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18744&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18753&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18807&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19550&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-276

Bill Comments

feedback