OH HB276 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20)
Status: Enrolled on November 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5534.817, 5534.893, 5534.894, and 5534.895 and to enact sections 5534.014, 5534.407, 5534.408, 5534.60, 5534.601, 5534.602, 5534.79, 5534.807, 5534.812, 5534.814, 5534.818, 5534.823, 5534.824, 5534.825, 5534.826, 5534.827, 5534.829, 5534.833, 5534.834, 5534.871, 5534.881, 5534.882, 5534.883, 5534.884, 5534.885, 5534.886, 5534.887, 5534.888, 5534.89, 5534.898, 5534.91, and 5534.916 of the Revised Code to designate and change the name and location of multiple memorial highways and bridges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate SEAL Edward C. Byers, Jr., Medal of Honor Recipient Hwy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenatePassed
2019-11-06SenateReported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-24SenateIntroduced
2019-06-20HousePassed
2019-06-11HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-06HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-06-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53New CodeSee Bill Text
5345New CodeSee Bill Text
5345823New CodeSee Bill Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5534New CodeSee Bill Text
5534014New CodeSee Bill Text
5534407New CodeSee Bill Text
5534408New CodeSee Bill Text
553460New CodeSee Bill Text
5534601New CodeSee Bill Text
5534602New CodeSee Bill Text
5534752New CodeSee Bill Text
553479New CodeSee Bill Text
5534807New CodeSee Bill Text
5534812New CodeSee Bill Text
5534814New CodeSee Bill Text
5534817Amended CodeCitation Text
5534818New CodeSee Bill Text
5534822New CodeSee Bill Text
5534823New CodeSee Bill Text
5534824New CodeSee Bill Text
5534825New CodeSee Bill Text
5534826New CodeSee Bill Text
5534827New CodeSee Bill Text
5534829New CodeSee Bill Text
5534833New CodeSee Bill Text
5534834New CodeSee Bill Text
5534871New CodeSee Bill Text
5534881New CodeSee Bill Text
5534882New CodeSee Bill Text
5534883New CodeSee Bill Text
5534884New CodeSee Bill Text
5534885New CodeSee Bill Text
5534886New CodeSee Bill Text
5534887New CodeSee Bill Text
5534888New CodeSee Bill Text
553489New CodeSee Bill Text
5534893Amended CodeCitation Text
5534894Amended CodeCitation Text
5534895Amended CodeCitation Text
5534896New CodeSee Bill Text
5534898New CodeSee Bill Text
553491New CodeSee Bill Text
5534913New CodeSee Bill Text
5534916New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback