OH HB276 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2903.21 of the Revised Code to expand the offense of aggravated menacing to prohibit threatening a utility worker, cable operator worker, or broadband worker with intent to obstruct the operation of a utility.
Title
Prohibit menacing utility worker with intent to obstruct utility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Criminal Justice |
2017-06-20 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2017-06-14 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Utilities
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 03 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |