OH HB27 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective 6/30/17 - Certain provisions effective 09/29/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective 6/30/17 - Certain provisions effective 09/29/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 742.38, 4113.21, 4121.125, 4121.44, 4123.29, 4123.343, 4123.512, 4123.53, 4123.54, 4123.56, 4123.57, 4123.66, 4123.68, 4123.71, 4123.84, 4125.05, 4125.051, 4125.07, 4167.01, 4167.02, and 4167.10 and to repeal sections 4123.72 and 4167.19 of the Revised Code to make changes to the Workers' Compensation Law, to prohibit a public employer from requiring an employee to pay for a medical examination as a condition of continued employment, to make appropriations for the Bureau of Workers' Compensation for the biennium beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2019, and to provide authorization and conditions for the operation of the Bureau's programs.
Title
Creates FY 2018-2019 Workers' Compensation budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Effective 6/30/17 - Certain provisions effective 09/29/17 | |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported: Finance |
2017-05-16 | House | Re-referred: Finance |
2017-05-16 | House | Re-referred - Substitute: Rules and Reference |
2017-02-08 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced |