OH HB27 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2111.01 and 2111.02, to enact sections 2111.022, 2112.01, 2112.011, 2112.02, 2112.03, 2112.04, 2112.05, 2112.21, 2112.22, 2112.23, 2112.24, 2112.25, 2112.26, 2112.27, 2112.31, 2112.32, 2112.41, 2112.42, and 2112.43, and to repeal section 2111.41 of the Revised Code to adopt the Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To adopt the Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act.

Sponsors

Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]
Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]
Rep. Terry Boose [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]
Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Timothy DeGeeter [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Mike Foley [D]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]
Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Ron Maag [R]
Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]
Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]
Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]
Sen. Shirley Smith [D]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]
Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]
Rep. Carlton Weddington [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-28 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-12 Committee Report
2012-12-04 To Judiciary
2012-12-04 Introduced to Senate
2012-11-28 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-11-15 Committee Report - S
2011-01-18 To Judiciary & Ethics
2011-01-18 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2111Amended CodeCitation Text
211101Amended CodeCitation Text
211102Amended CodeCitation Text
2111022New CodeSee Bill Text
211141Repealed CodeCitation Text
2112New CodeSee Bill Text
211201New CodeSee Bill Text
2112011New CodeSee Bill Text
211202New CodeSee Bill Text
211203New CodeSee Bill Text
211204New CodeSee Bill Text
211205New CodeSee Bill Text
211221New CodeSee Bill Text
211222New CodeSee Bill Text
211223New CodeSee Bill Text
211224New CodeSee Bill Text
211225New CodeSee Bill Text
211226New CodeSee Bill Text
211227New CodeSee Bill Text
211231New CodeSee Bill Text
211232New CodeSee Bill Text
211241New CodeSee Bill Text
211242New CodeSee Bill Text
211243New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback