OH HB258 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-2)
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Objection of the Governor sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 12 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Objection of the Governor sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2317.56, 2919.171, 2919.19, 2919.191, 2919.192, 2919.193, and 4731.22; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 2919.191 (2919.192), 2919.192 (2919.194), and 2919.193 (2919.198); and to enact new sections 2919.191 and 2919.193 and sections 2919.195, 2919.196, 2919.197, 2919.199, 2919.1910, and 2919.1911 of the Revised Code to generally prohibit an abortion of an unborn human individual with a detectable heartbeat and to create the Joint Legislative Committee on Adoption Promotion and Support.
Title
Prohibit abortion if unborn has detectable heartbeat
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-27 | Senate | Objection of the Governor sustained |
2018-12-27 | House | Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor |
2018-12-27 | House | Shall the bill pass notwithstanding objections? |
2018-12-21 | House | Veto receipt |
2018-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Passed |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-11-19 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-11-15 | House | Passed - Amended |
2017-12-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-06-06 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
State and Local Government : State Government
Courts and Civil Law : Courts
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Health and Human Services : Health Care
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 17 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 19 | 193 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |