OH HB254 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-33)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Effective 11/2/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 64-33)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Effective 11/2/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 9.50 of the Revised Code to enact the POW/MIA Remembrance Act requiring the POW/MIA flag to be displayed at certain buildings operated by the state on Armed Forces Day, Memorial Day, Flag Day, Independence Day, National POW/MIA Recognition Day, and Veterans' Day.
Title
Require POW/MIA Flag to be displayed on certain days
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-26 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | Effective 11/2/18 | |
2018-07-24 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | House | Passed |
2017-10-26 | House | Reported - Substitute: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security |
2017-06-06 | House | Refer to Committee: Armed Services, Veterans Affairs, and Homeland Security |
2017-05-31 | House | Introduced |