OH HB252 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Re-referred: Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 122.011 and 1724.02 and to enact section 1724.13 of the Revised Code to create the Land Reutilization Demolition Program and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the Land Reutilization Demolition Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30HouseRe-referred: Finance
2019-06-27HouseRe-referred: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-05-28HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
122011Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1724Amended CodeCitation Text
172402Amended CodeCitation Text
172413New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback