OH HB251 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 38-19)
Status: Passed on August 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-01 - Effective 8/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 135.14 and 135.35 of the Revised Code to increase from five to ten years the maturity period of other political subdivision's bonds and obligations eligible for investment of a subdivision's interim moneys, a county's inactive moneys, and money in the county public library fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase maturity of bonds eligible for investing interim money

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-01 Effective 8/1/18
2018-04-11SenatePassed
2018-02-28SenateReported: Finance
2017-11-15SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2017-10-25SenateIntroduced
2017-10-24HousePassed
2017-10-10HouseReported - Substitute: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-06-06HouseRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-05-31HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
135Amended CodeCitation Text
13514Amended CodeCitation Text
13535Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-HB-251
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/RH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/PS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb251/EN/05?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-HB-251

Bill Comments

feedback