OH HB248 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2317.56, 2919.171, 2919.19, 2919.191, 2919.192, 2919.193, and 4731.22; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicted in parentheses, sections 2919.191 (2919.192), 2919.192 (2919.194), and 2919.193 (2919.198); and to enact new sections 2919.191 and 2919.193 and sections 2919.195, 2919.196, 2919.197, 2919.199, 2919.1910, and 2919.1911 of the Revised Code to generally prohibit an abortion of an unborn human individual with a detectable heartbeat and to create the Joint Legislative Committee on Adoption Promotion and Support; and to amend the version of section 4731.22 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect April 1, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

That is scheduled to take effect April 1, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-10 - House - House - Bill Failed (Vote) (Y: 47 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-10 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2014-11-20 Committee Report - S
2013-08-21 To Health and Aging
2013-08-21 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2317Amended CodeCitation Text
231756Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
2919171Amended CodeCitation Text
291919Amended CodeCitation Text
2919191Amended CodeCitation Text
2919192Amended CodeCitation Text
2919193Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback