OH HB244 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 63-3)
Status: Passed on October 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-13 - Effective 10/13/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3701.13 and to enact sections 3301.601, 3301.65, and 3792.04 of the Revised Code regarding technology-based educational opportunities for, and the enrollment of, military children; regarding public schools, state institutions of higher education, and prohibitions on mandatory vaccinations and discrimination; and regarding the authority of the Ohio Department of Health over matters of quarantine and isolation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards educational opportunities/enrollment military kids

Sponsors

Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]
Rep. Susan Manchester [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. George Lang [R]
Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]
Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-13 Effective 10/13/21
2021-06-28HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-06-28SenatePassed - Amended
2021-06-16SenateReported: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-05-26SenateRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-05-19HousePassed
2021-05-12HouseReported - Amended: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-04-14HouseRefer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3301601New CodeSee Bill Text
330165New CodeSee Bill Text
370113Amended CodeCitation Text
379204New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-244
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/RH/01/hb244_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/PH/02/hb244_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/RS/03/hb244_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/PS/04/hb244_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/CH/05/hb244_05_CH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb244/EN/06/hb244_06_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16328&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16446&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16670&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16680&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16780&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16871&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17055&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17088&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17095&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17247&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17246&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17262&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17324&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-244

Bill Comments

feedback