OH HB240 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-25 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-25 - Refer to Committee: Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 5.236 and 3345.43 of the Revised Code to enact the "Respect Your Date Act" to designate the month of April as "Respect Your Date Month" and to require each state institution of higher education to adopt a policy regarding dating violence, domestic violence, sexual assault, stalking, and rape on campus and to declare an emergency.
Title
Require state higher ed to adopt sex offense policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-27 | House | Passed |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2017-06-06 | House | Refer to Committee: Higher Education and Workforce Development |
2017-05-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
33 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 45 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |