OH HB24 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 37-19)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.294 of the Revised Code to designate August 17 as "Eugene 'Gene' F. Kranz Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Eugene 'Gene' F. Kranz Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2021-05-18SenateIntroduced
2021-05-12HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseReported: State and Local Government
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-24
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb24/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb24/RH/01/hb24_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb24/PH/02/hb24_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15624&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16478&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16560&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16593&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16667&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16794&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-24

Bill Comments 750

feedback