OH HB24 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-15)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Effective 3/31/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.73, 935.19, 935.20, 955.16, 959.131, 959.132, 959.15, 959.21, 959.99, 1717.01, 1717.02, 1717.05, 1717.06, 1717.07, 1717.08, 1717.09, 1717.10, 2151.421, 2921.02, 2931.18, 4729.01, 4729.531, 4729.532, 4729.54, 4729.55, 5101.63, and 5147.22; to enact sections 955.151, 959.134, 1717.061, 1717.062, 1717.16, 1717.17, 1717.18, 4729.533, 4729.534, 4729.535, 4729.542, 4729.991, and 4741.201; and to repeal sections 1717.03, 1717.04, 1717.14, and 3113.10 of the Revised Code to make changes to humane society law, to make humane society agents subject to bribery law, to establish procedures for the seizure and impoundment of certain animals and livestock, to make changes to animal euthanasia and animal seizure laws, and to re-enact provisions of law governing animal fighting and bestiality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise humane society law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Effective 3/31/21
2020-12-08HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-12-03SenatePassed - Amended
2020-12-03SenateReported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-11-13SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2019-11-04SenateIntroduced
2019-10-30HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseReported - Substitute: Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-02-13HouseRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
10973Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1717Amended CodeCitation Text
171701Amended CodeCitation Text
171702Amended CodeCitation Text
171703Amended CodeCitation Text
171704Amended CodeCitation Text
171705Amended CodeCitation Text
171706Amended CodeCitation Text
1717061New CodeSee Bill Text
1717062New CodeSee Bill Text
171707Amended CodeCitation Text
171708Amended CodeCitation Text
171709Amended CodeCitation Text
171710Amended CodeCitation Text
171714Repealed CodeCitation Text
171716New CodeSee Bill Text
171717New CodeSee Bill Text
171718New CodeSee Bill Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2151Amended CodeCitation Text
2151421Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2921Amended CodeCitation Text
292102Amended CodeCitation Text
2931Amended CodeCitation Text
293118Amended CodeCitation Text
31Repealed CodeCitation Text
3113Repealed CodeCitation Text
311310Repealed CodeCitation Text
472901Amended CodeCitation Text
4729531Amended CodeCitation Text
4729532Amended CodeCitation Text
4729533New CodeSee Bill Text
4729534New CodeSee Bill Text
4729535New CodeSee Bill Text
472954Amended CodeCitation Text
4729542New CodeSee Bill Text
472955Amended CodeCitation Text
4729991New CodeSee Bill Text
4741201New CodeSee Bill Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510163Amended CodeCitation Text
5147Amended CodeCitation Text
514722Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
935Amended CodeCitation Text
93519Amended CodeCitation Text
93520Amended CodeCitation Text
955Amended CodeCitation Text
955151New CodeSee Bill Text
95516Amended CodeCitation Text
959Amended CodeCitation Text
959131Amended CodeCitation Text
959132Amended CodeCitation Text
959134New CodeSee Bill Text
95915Amended CodeCitation Text
95921Amended CodeCitation Text
95999Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback