OH HB24 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-32)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Effective 3/30/18 - Certain provisions effective 7/01/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3350.15, 5124.01, 5124.101, 5124.15, 5124.151, 5124.152, 5124.17, 5124.19, 5124.191, 5124.192, 5124.193, 5124.195, 5124.21, 5124.23, 5124.28, 5124.29, 5124.30, 5124.38, 5124.39, 5124.40, 5124.41, 5124.46, 5124.68, 5705.21, 5709.121, 5709.17, 5735.01, 5735.024, 5735.04, and 5747.01; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 5124.17 (5124.171), 5124.19 (5124.195), 5124.191 (5124.196), 5124.192 (5124.197), 5124.193 (5124.198), 5124.195 (5124.199), 5124.21 (5124.211), and 5124.23 (5124.231); to enact new sections 5124.17, 5124.19, 5124.191, 5124.192, 5124.193, 5124.194, 5124.21, and 5124.23 and section 5124.24; to repeal sections 5124.155 and 5124.194 of the Revised Code; to amend Section 261.168 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly; and to repeal Section 261.169 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly to modify the existing tax exemption for veterans organizations' property, to make appropriations and otherwise provide authorization and conditions for the operation of state programs, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify veterans organization property tax exemption

Sponsors

Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Rep. Niraj Antani [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Candice Keller [R]
Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Rep. Martin Sweeney [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Effective 3/30/18 - Certain provisions effective 7/01/18
2018-03-21HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-03-21SenatePassed
2018-03-21SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2018-03-13SenateRecommitted: Ways and Means
2018-02-28SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2017-10-25SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-10-12SenateIntroduced
2017-10-11HousePassed
2017-06-20HouseReported: Ways and Means
2017-02-08HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-02-01HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3350Amended CodeCitation Text
335015Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5124Amended CodeCitation Text
512401Amended CodeCitation Text
5124101Amended CodeCitation Text
512415Amended CodeCitation Text
5124151Amended CodeCitation Text
5124152Amended CodeCitation Text
5124155Repealed CodeCitation Text
512417Amended CodeCitation Text
512419Amended CodeCitation Text
5124191Amended CodeCitation Text
5124192Amended CodeCitation Text
5124193Amended CodeCitation Text
5124194Repealed CodeCitation Text
5124195Amended CodeCitation Text
512421Amended CodeCitation Text
512423Amended CodeCitation Text
512428Amended CodeCitation Text
512429Amended CodeCitation Text
512430Amended CodeCitation Text
512438Amended CodeCitation Text
512439Amended CodeCitation Text
512440Amended CodeCitation Text
512441Amended CodeCitation Text
512446Amended CodeCitation Text
512468Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
570521Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
5709121Amended CodeCitation Text
570917Amended CodeCitation Text
5735Amended CodeCitation Text
573501Amended CodeCitation Text
5735024Amended CodeCitation Text
573504Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-HB-24
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/RCS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/RRS/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/PS/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/CH/07?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/hb24/EN/08?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-HB-24

Bill Comments

feedback