OH HB24 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]


To amend sections 173.501, 173.521, 173.542, 2317.54, 4715.36, 5101.60, 5101.61, 5101.611, 5101.62 to 5101.64, 5101.66 to 5101.71, 5101.99, 5123.61, and 5126.31; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 5101.61 (5101.63), 5101.611 (5101.64), 5101.62 (5101.65), 5101.63 (5101.651), 5101.64 (5101.66), 5101.65 (5101.68), 5101.66 (5101.681), 5101.67 (5101.682), 5101.68 (5101.69), 5101.69 (5101.70), 5101.70 (5101.71), 5101.71 (5101.61), and 5101.72 (5101.611); and to enact new section 5101.62 and sections 5101.631, 5101.632, 5101.701, 5101.702, 5101.74, and 5101.741 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing the provision of adult protective services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Adult protective services - revise law


Roll Calls

2015-03-17 - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-03-25SenateRefer to Committee: Health and Human Services
2015-03-18SenateSaid Bill/s Considered First Time
2015-03-17HouseBill Passed
2015-03-11HouseAccept Standing Committee Report - Amended: Judiciary
2015-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2015-01-29HouseIntroduce Legislation


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
173Amended CodeCitation Text
173501Amended CodeCitation Text
173521Amended CodeCitation Text
173542Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2317Amended CodeCitation Text
231754Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4715Amended CodeCitation Text
471536Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510160Amended CodeCitation Text
510161Amended CodeCitation Text
5101611Amended CodeCitation Text
510162Amended CodeCitation Text
510163Amended CodeCitation Text
510164Amended CodeCitation Text
510165Amended CodeCitation Text
510166Amended CodeCitation Text
510167Amended CodeCitation Text
510168Amended CodeCitation Text
510169Amended CodeCitation Text
510170Amended CodeCitation Text
510171Amended CodeCitation Text
510172Amended CodeCitation Text
510199Amended CodeCitation Text
5123Amended CodeCitation Text
512361Amended CodeCitation Text
5126Amended CodeCitation Text
512631Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

Bill Comments