OH HB231 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the State Board of Pharmacy to operate a pilot program for dispensing schedule II controlled substances in lockable or tamper-evident containers.
Title
Require dispensing of prescription drugs in lockable container
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-14 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-20 | House | Passed |
2018-05-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Health |
2017-05-23 | House | Refer to Committee: Health |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Health and Human Services : Public Health
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 19 | 051 | New Code | See Bill Text |