OH HB230 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-15)
Status: Engrossed on November 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 107.03, 125.18, and 126.506 and to enact sections 103.28, 126.41, and 126.42 of the Revised Code regarding the state's information technology systems and shared services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards Ohio's information technology systems/shared services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-23SenateIntroduced
2021-11-17HousePassed
2021-11-01HouseReported - Substitute: Technology and Innovation
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Technology and Innovation
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10328New CodeSee Bill Text
10703Amended CodeCitation Text
12518Amended CodeCitation Text
12641New CodeSee Bill Text
12642New CodeSee Bill Text
126506Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-230
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb230/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb230/RH/01/hb230_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb230/PH/02/hb230_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16282&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16505&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17061&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17726&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17838&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17897&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-230

Bill Comments

feedback