OH HB230 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4781.40, 5301.072, 5311.191, and 5321.131 of the Revised Code to prohibit manufactured home park operators, condominium associations, neighborhood associations, and landlords from restricting the display of the thin blue line flag.
Title
Prohibit restricting display of thin blue line flag
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-29 | House | Passed |
2017-09-20 | House | Reported: Economic Development, Commerce, and Labor |
2017-05-23 | House | Refer to Committee: Economic Development, Commerce, and Labor |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 81 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 81 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 01 | 072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 11 | 191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
53 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
53 | 21 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |