OH HB229 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-08 - Reported - Amended: Agriculture and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3729.05 and to enact section 3729.15 of the Revised Code to provide a qualified immunity to camp operators for harm arising from a risk inherent to camping and to exempt sites that host historical reenactor camps from the recreational and camping operation license requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide qualified immunity to camp operators for inherent risks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 65 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-08SenateReported - Amended: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-05-19SenateRefer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources
2021-05-12HousePassed
2021-05-03HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372905Amended CodeCitation Text
372915New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-229
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb229/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb229/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb229/PH/02/hb229_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb229/RS/03/hb229_03_RS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16270&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16340&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16483&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16632&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16806&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16815&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18000&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18001&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18011&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-229

Bill Comments

feedback