OH HB228 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 55-1)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 9.68, 109.801, 307.93, 307.932, 2901.05, 2923.11, 2923.121, 2923.126, 2923.129, 2923.1212, 2923.18, 2923.20, and 2953.37 and to enact sections 9.69 and 2923.1214 of the Revised Code to modify the law governing state preemption of local firearm regulations and related remedies, the grounds for self-defense and the burden of proof, the authority of a law enforcement officer or investigator to carry a weapon, the offense of unlawful transactions in weapons, and other weapons-related laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards self-defense and handling firearms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27SenatePassed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
2018-12-27HousePassed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
2018-12-27HouseShall the bill pass notwithstanding objections?
2018-12-27HouseDispense Reading Line Item Veto Message - Agreed To Without Objection
2018-12-20HouseVeto receipt
2018-12-06HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-12-06SenatePassed - Amended
2018-12-06SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2018-11-28SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2018-11-19SenateIntroduced
2018-11-14HousePassed - Amended
2018-05-23HouseReported - Substitute: Federalism and Interstate Relations
2017-05-23HouseRefer to Committee: Federalism and Interstate Relations
2017-05-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
109Amended CodeCitation Text
109801Amended CodeCitation Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2307Amended CodeCitation Text
2307601Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2901Amended CodeCitation Text
290105Amended CodeCitation Text
290109Amended CodeCitation Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
292311Amended CodeCitation Text
292312Amended CodeCitation Text
2923121Amended CodeCitation Text
29231212Repealed CodeCitation Text
29231214New CodeSee Bill Text
2923126Amended CodeCitation Text
2923129Amended CodeCitation Text
292316Amended CodeCitation Text
292318Amended CodeCitation Text
292320Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295337Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
30793Amended CodeCitation Text
307932Amended CodeCitation Text
53Amended CodeCitation Text
5321Amended CodeCitation Text
532101Amended CodeCitation Text
532113Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback