OH HB226 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-11-10 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2921.03 and 2921.04 of the Revised Code to expand intimidation offenses to include guardians ad litem and court appointed special advocates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand intimidation offenses to guardians ad litem/advocates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-10SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-11-02SenateIntroduced
2021-10-27HousePassed
2021-10-25HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
292103Amended CodeCitation Text
292104Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-226
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb226/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb226/RH/01/hb226_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb226/PH/02/hb226_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16552&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16951&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17633&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17666&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17739&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17957&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-226

Bill Comments

feedback